TX SB625 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-22 - Placed on General State Calendar
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-22 - Placed on General State Calendar
Summary
Relating to the representation of indigent defendants in criminal cases.
Title
Relating to the representation of indigent defendants in criminal cases.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-22 | Placed on General State Calendar | |
2009-05-20 | Considered in Calendars | |
2009-05-13 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2009-05-12 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-12 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-05-07 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-05-07 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-05-07 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2009-04-29 | No action taken in committee | |
2009-04-29 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-04-22 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-04-22 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-04-22 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-22 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-31 | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence | |
2009-03-31 | Read first time | |
2009-03-19 | Received from the Senate | |
2009-03-19 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-03-19 | Record vote | |
2009-03-19 | Passed | |
2009-03-19 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-03-19 | Record vote | |
2009-03-19 | Three day rule suspended | |
2009-03-19 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-03-19 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | |
2009-03-19 | Laid before the Senate | |
2009-03-19 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-03-09 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-03-09 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-03-09 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | |
2009-03-04 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-04 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-02-23 | Referred to Jurisprudence | |
2009-02-23 | Read first time | |
2009-02-02 | Filed | |
2009-02-02 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--Defense Counsel
INDIGENT DEFENSE COUNCIL, TEXAS
INDIGENT LEGAL SERVICES
Criminal Procedure--Defense Counsel
INDIGENT DEFENSE COUNCIL, TEXAS
INDIGENT LEGAL SERVICES