TX SB623 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-16 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-16 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the investigation and punishment of certain sexual offenses, to protective orders issued on the basis of certain sexual offenses, to crime victims' compensation, and to the establishment of a state sexual offense prevention and response program for the Texas Military Department.
Title
Relating to the investigation and punishment of certain sexual offenses, to protective orders issued on the basis of certain sexual offenses, to crime victims' compensation, and to the establishment of a state sexual offense prevention and response program for the Texas Military Department.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-28 - Senate - Senate concurs in House amendment(s) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1366 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1366 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-16 | Effective on 9/1/21 | |
2021-06-16 | Signed by the Governor | |
2021-06-01 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-05-31 | House | Signed in the House |
2021-05-30 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2021-05-29 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2021-05-28 | House | Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Senate concurs in House amendment(s) |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Read |
2021-05-28 | Senate | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate |
2021-05-24 | Senate | House passage as amended reported |
2021-05-24 | House | Record vote RV#1366 |
2021-05-24 | House | Passed |
2021-05-24 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-05-23 | House | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2021-05-23 | House | Amended 1-Minjarez |
2021-05-23 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-05-21 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2021-05-19 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-04-29 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-04-29 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-29 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-26 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-04-26 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-19 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-19 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-04-19 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-19 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-04-14 | House | Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs |
2021-04-14 | House | Read first time |
2021-04-13 | House | Received from the Senate |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Passed |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Referred to Vet Affairs & Border Security |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Filed |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB4250 (Same As) 2021-04-07 - Left pending in committee
HB4250 (Same As) 2021-04-07 - Left pending in committee
HB4250 (Same As) 2021-04-07 - Left pending in committee
Subjects
CRIME VICTIMS
Crime Victims Compensation
Crimes
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--Sexual
MILITARY DEPARTMENT, TEXAS
PROTECTIVE ORDERS
RANGERS
SEXUAL ASSAULT
SEXUAL HARASSMENT
Crime Victims Compensation
Crimes
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--Sexual
MILITARY DEPARTMENT, TEXAS
PROTECTIVE ORDERS
RANGERS
SEXUAL ASSAULT
SEXUAL HARASSMENT