TX SB6 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-14 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-14 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to liability for certain claims arising during a pandemic or disaster related to a pandemic.
Title
Relating to liability for certain claims arising during a pandemic or disaster related to a pandemic.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-28 - Senate - Senate concurs in House amendment(s) (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-05-24 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1355 (Y: 133 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Amendment withdrawn (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Amendment tabled (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Amendment withdrawn (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Amendment tabled (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-05-24 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1355 (Y: 133 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Amendment withdrawn (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Amendment tabled (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Amendment withdrawn (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Amendment tabled (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-14 | Effective immediately | |
2021-06-14 | Signed by the Governor | |
2021-06-01 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-05-31 | House | Signed in the House |
2021-05-30 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2021-05-29 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2021-05-28 | House | Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Senate concurs in House amendment(s) |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Read |
2021-05-28 | Senate | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate |
2021-05-24 | Senate | House passage as amended reported |
2021-05-24 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-24 | House | Record vote RV#1355 |
2021-05-24 | House | Passed |
2021-05-24 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-05-23 | House | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2021-05-23 | House | Amendment withdrawn 3-Schofield |
2021-05-23 | House | Amendment withdrawn 2-Slaton, et al. |
2021-05-23 | House | Point of order withdrawn (amendment) Rule 11, Section 3 |
2021-05-23 | House | Amendment(s) offered 2-Slaton, Swanson, and Tinderholt |
2021-05-23 | House | Amended 1-Leach and Tinderholt |
2021-05-23 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-05-21 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2021-05-19 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-05-17 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-05-17 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-05-14 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-28 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-04-28 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-04-28 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-13 | House | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence |
2021-04-13 | House | Read first time |
2021-04-09 | House | Received from the Senate |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Passed |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA6 Hall |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Amended |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA5 Johnson |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Amendment tabled |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA4 Hall |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Amended |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA3 Hancock |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Amended |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA2 Hancock |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Amended |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA1 Hancock |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Referred to Business & Commerce |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Filed |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB3659 (Same As) 2021-04-14 - Left pending in committee
Subjects
Civil Remedies & Liabilities
COVID-19
Day Care
Disaster Preparedness & Relief
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--General
Education--Junior College Districts
Education--School Districts
Health
Health Care Providers
Health--Emergency Services & Personnel
Health--Other Diseases & Medical Conditions
PHYSICIANS
COVID-19
Day Care
Disaster Preparedness & Relief
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--General
Education--Junior College Districts
Education--School Districts
Health
Health Care Providers
Health--Emergency Services & Personnel
Health--Other Diseases & Medical Conditions
PHYSICIANS