TX HB3659 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-14 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to liability for certain claims arising during a pandemic or other disaster or emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to liability for certain claims arising during a pandemic or other disaster or emergency.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-14HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-04-14HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-04-14HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-04-14HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-14HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-22HouseReferred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
2021-03-22HouseRead first time
2021-03-10HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB6 (Same As) 2021-06-14 - Effective immediately

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback