TX SB592 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the creation of the Brickston Municipal Utility District; granting a limited power of eminent domain; providing authority to issue bonds; providing authority to impose assessments, fees, and taxes.
Title
Relating to the creation of the Brickston Municipal Utility District; granting a limited power of eminent domain; providing authority to issue bonds; providing authority to impose assessments, fees, and taxes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-25 - Senate - Senate concurs in House amendment(s) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1608 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1608 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-10 | Effective immediately | |
2019-06-10 | Signed by the Governor | |
2019-05-26 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-26 | House | Signed in the House |
2019-05-26 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2019-05-25 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-25 | House | Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported |
2019-05-25 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-25 | Senate | Senate concurs in House amendment(s) |
2019-05-25 | Senate | Read |
2019-05-25 | Senate | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate |
2019-05-22 | Senate | House passage as amended reported |
2019-05-22 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-22 | House | Record vote RV#1608 |
2019-05-22 | House | Passed |
2019-05-22 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-22 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-22 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2019-05-22 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-22 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2019-05-20 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2019-05-15 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2019-05-14 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-05-14 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-05-14 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-05-14 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2019-05-14 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-05-14 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-04-29 | House | Referred to Land & Resource Management |
2019-04-29 | House | Read first time |
2019-04-26 | House | Received from the Senate |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Passed |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Recommendations filed with the Senate |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Transmitted to the Governor |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Filed |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB1434 (Same As) 2019-03-26 - Left pending in committee
Subjects
BRICKSTON MUNICIPAL UTILITY DISTRICT
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Municipal Utility Districts
Special Districts & Authorities--Water & Utility
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Municipal Utility Districts
Special Districts & Authorities--Water & Utility