TX SB580 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Effective on 9/1/11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Effective on 9/1/11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to community assistance and economic development program activities of the Lavaca-Navidad River Authority.
Title
Relating to community assistance and economic development program activities of the Lavaca-Navidad River Authority.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-17 | Effective on 9/1/11 | |
2011-06-17 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-05-21 | Sent to the Governor | |
2011-05-21 | Signed in the House | |
2011-05-21 | Signed in the Senate | |
2011-05-20 | Reported enrolled | |
2011-05-20 | House passage reported | |
2011-05-19 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-19 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-19 | Record vote | |
2011-05-19 | Passed | |
2011-05-19 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-05-19 | Record vote | |
2011-05-19 | Constitutional three day rule suspended | |
2011-05-19 | Passed to 3rd reading | |
2011-05-19 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-05-19 | Laid out in lieu of companion | |
2011-04-27 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2011-04-26 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-04-26 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-04-18 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2011-04-18 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2011-04-18 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2011-04-04 | Referred to Transportation | |
2011-04-04 | Read first time | |
2011-03-17 | Received from the Senate | |
2011-03-16 | Reported engrossed | |
2011-03-16 | Record vote | |
2011-03-16 | Passed | |
2011-03-16 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-03-16 | Record vote | |
2011-03-16 | Three day rule suspended | |
2011-03-16 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-03-16 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | |
2011-03-16 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2011-03-15 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2011-03-14 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2011-03-14 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-03-14 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | |
2011-03-09 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2011-03-09 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-09 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-02-17 | Referred to Economic Development | |
2011-02-17 | Read first time | |
2011-02-09 | Filed | |
2011-02-09 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Economic & Industrial Development
Economic & Industrial Development--General
LAVACA-NAVIDAD RIVER AUTHORITY
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--River Authorities
Economic & Industrial Development--General
LAVACA-NAVIDAD RIVER AUTHORITY
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--River Authorities