TX SB576 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the prosecution and punishment of the offense of smuggling of persons.
Title
Relating to the prosecution and punishment of the offense of smuggling of persons.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-26 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1513 (Y: 137 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-14 | Effective on 9/1/21 | |
2021-06-14 | Signed by the Governor | |
2021-06-01 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-05-31 | House | Signed in the House |
2021-05-30 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2021-05-27 | Senate | House passage reported |
2021-05-26 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-26 | House | Record vote RV#1513 |
2021-05-26 | House | Passed |
2021-05-26 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-05-25 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2021-05-25 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-05-25 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2021-05-23 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-05-20 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-05-20 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-05-20 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-05-18 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-05-18 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-05-18 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-05-18 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-05-11 | House | Referred to State Affairs |
2021-05-11 | House | Read first time |
2021-05-05 | House | Received from the Senate |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Passed |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Corrected comm. report printed & distributed |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Filed |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB687 (Same As) 2021-05-13 - Placed on General State Calendar
Subjects
Agriculture
Crimes
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--General
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
HUMAN TRAFFICKING
Weapons
Crimes
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--General
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
HUMAN TRAFFICKING
Weapons