TX SB568 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-25 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the prosecution of and punishment for the criminal offense of hindering the investigation or prosecution of certain sexual offenses committed against a child; increasing criminal penalties.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the prosecution of and punishment for the criminal offense of hindering the investigation or prosecution of certain sexual offenses committed against a child; increasing criminal penalties.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-19 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-25HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-05-23HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-05-23HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-05-23HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-05-23HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-05-19HouseReported favorably as substituted
2021-05-19HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-05-19HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2021-05-17HouseFailed to receive affirmative vote in comm.
2021-05-17HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-05-17HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2021-05-03HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-05-03HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-05-03HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-05-03HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-03HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-04-21HouseReferred to Criminal Jurisprudence
2021-04-21HouseRead first time
2021-04-20HouseReceived from the Senate
2021-04-19SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2021-04-19SenateReported engrossed
2021-04-19SenateRecord vote
2021-04-19SenatePassed
2021-04-19SenateRead 3rd time
2021-04-19SenateRecord vote
2021-04-19SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-04-19SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-04-19SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2021-04-19SenateLaid before the Senate
2021-04-19SenateNot again placed on intent calendar
2021-04-19SenateCo-author authorized
2021-04-15SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-04-12SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-04-12SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2021-04-12SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2021-04-08SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-08SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-11SenateReferred to Criminal Justice
2021-03-11SenateRead first time
2021-02-02SenateFiled
2021-02-02SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB500 (Same As) 2021-02-25 - Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB568
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00568I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00568S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00568E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00568H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00568I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB00568I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB00568E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB00568H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00568H.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ04-19-F1.PDF#page=4

Bill Comments 750

feedback