TX SB567 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-17 - Committee report printed and distributed
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-17 - Committee report printed and distributed
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to firefighters enrolled in fire science courses.
Title
Relating to firefighters enrolled in fire science courses.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-17 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Vote taken in committee |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Reported from s/c favorably w/o amendments |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Testimony taken in subcommittee |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Considered by subcommittee |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Referred to s/c on Higher Education by Pres |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Filed |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB2158 (Similar To) 2023-05-18 - Left pending in committee
HB2158 (Similar To) 2023-05-18 - Left pending in committee
HB2158 (Similar To) 2023-05-18 - Left pending in committee
Subjects
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Tuition
Fire Fighters & Police
Fire Fighters & Police--General
Fire Fighters & Police--Volunteer
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Tuition
Fire Fighters & Police
Fire Fighters & Police--General
Fire Fighters & Police--Volunteer
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS