TX SB556 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-25 - Co-author authorized
Pending: Senate Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-25 - Co-author authorized
Pending: Senate Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to Medicaid reimbursement for dental services provided to adults with disabilities.
Title
Relating to Medicaid reimbursement for dental services provided to adults with disabilities.
Sponsors
Sen. Lois Kolkhorst [R] | Sen. Jose Menendez [D] | Sen. Borris Miles [D] | Sen. Beverly Powell [D] |
Sen. Royce West [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-25 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Referred to Health & Human Services |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Filed |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB1647 (Same As) 2019-05-01 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Subjects
DENTAL SERVICES
Disabilities, Persons with
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Human Services
Human Services--Medical Assistance
MEDICAID
Disabilities, Persons with
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Human Services
Human Services--Medical Assistance
MEDICAID
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=SB556 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/SB00556I.htm |