TX SB552 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-20 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-20 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to prohibiting contracts or other agreements with certain foreign-owned companies in connection with agricultural land.
Title
Relating to prohibiting contracts or other agreements with certain foreign-owned companies in connection with agricultural land.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-20 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Rereferred to committee |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Referred to Business & Commerce |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Filed |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Agriculture
Business & Commerce
Business & Commerce--General
INTERNATIONAL BUSINESS & COMMERCE
INTERNATIONAL RELATIONS
Business & Commerce
Business & Commerce--General
INTERNATIONAL BUSINESS & COMMERCE
INTERNATIONAL RELATIONS