TX SB543 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-29 - Co-author authorized
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-29 - Co-author authorized
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to performance-based tuition limitations for certain public institutions of higher education and a temporary tuition limitation for those institutions.
Title
Relating to performance-based tuition limitations for certain public institutions of higher education and a temporary tuition limitation for those institutions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-29 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Higher Education |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Filed |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Finance
Education--Higher--Institutions & Programs
Education--Higher--Tuition
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS
LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Finance
Education--Higher--Institutions & Programs
Education--Higher--Tuition
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS
LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD