TX SB531 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-28 - Co-author authorized
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-28 - Co-author authorized
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the standard service and disability retirement benefits for members of the employee class of the Employees Retirement System of Texas.
Title
Relating to the standard service and disability retirement benefits for members of the employee class of the Employees Retirement System of Texas.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-28 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Referred to Finance |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Filed |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB1473 (Same As) 2023-03-03 - Referred to Pensions, Investments & Financial Services
HB1473 (Same As) 2023-03-03 - Referred to Pensions, Investments & Financial Services
HB1473 (Same As) 2023-03-03 - Referred to Pensions, Investments & Financial Services
Subjects
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=88R&Bill=SB531 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/88R/billtext/html/SB00531I.htm |