TX SB518 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-06 - Referred to Higher Education
Pending: House Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-06 - Referred to Higher Education
Pending: House Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the consideration of standardized test scores as a factor in nonautomatic admissions decisions at certain public institutions of higher education.
Title
Relating to the consideration of standardized test scores as a factor in nonautomatic admissions decisions at certain public institutions of higher education.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-03 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-03 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-03 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-06 | House | Referred to Higher Education |
2023-05-06 | House | Read first time |
2023-05-04 | House | Received from the Senate |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Passed |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Vote taken in committee |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Reported from s/c favorably w/o amendments |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Considered by subcommittee |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Left pending in subcommittee |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Testimony taken in subcommittee |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Considered by subcommittee |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Referred to s/c on Higher Education by Pres |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Filed |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Admission & Attendance
Education--Higher--Institutions & Programs
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Admission & Attendance
Education--Higher--Institutions & Programs