TX SB514 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-07 - Co-author authorized
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to speech protections for student publications in public schools.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to speech protections for student publications in public schools.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-07SenateCo-author authorized
2019-04-23SenateLeft pending in committee
2019-04-23SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-04-23SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-23SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-02-14SenateReferred to Education
2019-02-14SenateRead first time
2019-01-29SenateFiled
2019-01-29SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB2244 (Same As) 2019-04-17 - Committee report sent to Calendars

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback