TX SB498 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-23 - No action taken in committee
Status: Introduced on January 16 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-23 - No action taken in committee
Summary
Relating to the release of a criminal defendant on partial bail and to the procedures governing a cash bond.
Title
Relating to the release of a criminal defendant on partial bail and to the procedures governing a cash bond.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-23 | No action taken in committee | |
2009-04-23 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-04-21 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-04-21 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2009-04-21 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-21 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-02-17 | Referred to Criminal Justice | |
2009-02-17 | Read first time | |
2009-01-16 | Filed | |
2009-01-16 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |