TX SB487 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-24 - Postponed 6/9/21
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-24 - Postponed 6/9/21
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the applicability of certain laws to open-enrollment charter schools.
Title
Relating to the applicability of certain laws to open-enrollment charter schools.
Sponsors
Sen. Bryan Hughes [R] | Sen. Paul Bettencourt [R] | Sen. Donna Campbell [R] | Sen. Eddie Lucio [D] |
Rep. Joe Deshotel [D] | Rep. Ben Leman [R] | Rep. Dan Huberty [R] | Rep. Brad Buckley [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-14 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 23 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-14 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-14 - Senate - Vote recorded in Journal (Y: 22 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-14 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 21 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-14 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-14 - Senate - Vote recorded in Journal (Y: 22 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-14 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 21 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-24 | House | Postponed 6/9/21 |
2021-05-24 | House | Point of order withdrawn Rule 4, Section 32(c)(2) |
2021-05-24 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-05-24 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2021-05-20 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-05-20 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-05-19 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-05-19 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-05-18 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-05-18 | House | Vote reconsidered in committee |
2021-05-18 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-05-18 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-05-18 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-05-17 | House | Referred to Land & Resource Management |
2021-05-17 | House | Read first time |
2021-05-17 | House | Received from the Senate |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Passed |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Amended |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA1 Hughes |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Referred to Education |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Filed |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB1348 (Same As) 2021-05-06 - Postponed 6/27/21 10:00 AM
Subjects
City Government
City Government--Land Use & Zoning
County Government
County Government--Land Use & Zoning
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Charter Schools
Political Subdivisions
City Government--Land Use & Zoning
County Government
County Government--Land Use & Zoning
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Charter Schools
Political Subdivisions