TX HB1348 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-06 - Postponed 6/27/21 10:00 AM
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the applicability of certain laws to open-enrollment charter schools.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the applicability of certain laws to open-enrollment charter schools.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-05 - House - Failed to pass to engrossment RV#778 (Y: 66 N: 72 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-06HousePostponed 6/27/21 10:00 AM
2021-05-06HousePoint of order withdrawn Rule 4, Section 32(c)(1), (2), and (5)
2021-05-06HouseLaid out as postponed business
2021-05-06HousePostponed 5/6/21 11:30 AM
2021-05-06HouseVote reconsidered
2021-05-05House1 hr. notice-for reconsideration
2021-05-05HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-05HouseRecord vote RV#778
2021-05-05HouseFailed to pass to engrossment
2021-05-05HouseAmended 4-Anchia
2021-05-05HouseAmended 3-J.D. Johnson
2021-05-05HouseAmended 2-Deshotel
2021-05-05HouseAmended 1-Deshotel
2021-05-05HouseRead 2nd time
2021-05-05HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-05-03HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-04-23HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-03-26HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-03-26HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-03-25HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-03-16HouseReported favorably as substituted
2021-03-16HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-03-16HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-03-16HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-16HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-05HouseReferred to Land & Resource Management
2021-03-05HouseRead first time
2021-01-25HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB487 (Same As) 2021-05-24 - Postponed 6/9/21

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB1348
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB01348I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB01348H.htm
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB01348H21.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB01348H22.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB01348H23.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB01348H24.HTM
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB01348I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB01348H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB01348H.htm
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB1348&RcdVtNo=778&Ch=H&Dt=05/05/2021

Bill Comments

feedback