TX SB461 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-28 - Effective on 9/1/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to false or misleading packaging, labeling, or advertising of certain abusable synthetic substances; providing civil penalties; creating a criminal offense.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to false or misleading packaging, labeling, or advertising of certain abusable synthetic substances; providing civil penalties; creating a criminal offense.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-05-19 - House - SB 461Third Reading House (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-05-28 Effective on 9/1/15
2015-05-28 Signed by the Governor
2015-05-20 Sent to the Governor
2015-05-20HouseSigned in the House
2015-05-20SenateSigned in the Senate
2015-05-19SenateReported enrolled
2015-05-19SenateHouse passage reported
2015-05-19HouseRecord vote
2015-05-19HousePassed
2015-05-19HouseRead 3rd time
2015-05-18HousePassed to 3rd reading
2015-05-18HouseStatement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
2015-05-18HouseAmendment withdrawn
2015-05-18HouseLaid out as postponed business
2015-05-12HousePostponed
2015-05-12HouseRead 2nd time
2015-05-12HouseLaid out in lieu of companion
2015-05-11HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2015-05-08HouseCommittee report distributed
2015-05-08HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2015-05-06HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2015-05-06HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2015-04-30HouseReferred to Criminal Jurisprudence
2015-04-30HouseRead first time
2015-03-25HouseReceived from the Senate
2015-03-24SenateReported engrossed
2015-03-24SenateRecord vote
2015-03-24SenatePassed
2015-03-24SenateRead 3rd time
2015-03-24SenateRecord vote
2015-03-24SenateThree day rule suspended
2015-03-24SenateVote recorded in Journal
2015-03-24SenatePassed to engrossment as amended
2015-03-24SenateVote recorded in Journal
2015-03-24SenateAmended
2015-03-24SenateAmendment(s) offered
2015-03-24SenateRead 2nd time
2015-03-24SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2015-03-23SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2015-03-18SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2015-03-18SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2015-03-18SenateReported favorably as substituted
2015-03-17SenateConsidered in public hearing
2015-03-10SenateLeft pending in committee
2015-03-10SenateTestimony taken in committee
2015-03-10SenateConsidered in public hearing
2015-03-10SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2015-02-10SenateReferred to Criminal Justice
2015-02-10SenateRead first time
2015-02-05SenateFiled
2015-02-05SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback