TX SB435 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on May 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-24 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on May 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-24 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the disclosure under the public information law of certain evidence of a crime that resulted in the death of a person.
Title
Relating to the disclosure under the public information law of certain evidence of a crime that resulted in the death of a person.
Sponsors
Sen. Mayes Middleton [R] | Sen. Paul Bettencourt [R] | Sen. Sarah Eckhardt [D] | Sen. Bob Hall [R] |
Sen. Lois Kolkhorst [R] | Sen. Royce West [D] | Sen. John Whitmire [D] | Rep. Greg Bonnen [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-05-11 - Senate - Senate concurs in House amendment(s) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-06 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1176 (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2023-04-20 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-20 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-20 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-20 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-20 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-06 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1176 (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2023-04-20 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-20 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-20 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-20 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-20 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-24 | Effective immediately | |
2023-05-24 | Signed by the Governor | |
2023-05-12 | Sent to the Governor | |
2023-05-12 | House | Signed in the House |
2023-05-12 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2023-05-11 | House | Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Senate concurs in House amendment(s) |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Read |
2023-05-11 | Senate | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate |
2023-05-08 | Senate | House passage as amended reported |
2023-05-06 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-06 | House | Record vote RV#1176 |
2023-05-06 | House | Passed |
2023-05-06 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-05-06 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-06 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2023-05-06 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-05-06 | House | Laid out in lieu of companion HB 3729 |
2023-05-06 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2023-05-05 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-05-05 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-05-04 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2023-05-04 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2023-05-04 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2023-05-04 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2023-04-24 | House | Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety |
2023-04-24 | House | Read first time |
2023-04-21 | House | Received from the Senate |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Passed |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Vote taken in committee |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-01-12 | Senate | Filed |
2023-01-12 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB3729 (Same As) 2023-05-06 - Laid on the table subject to call
HB3729 (Same As) 2023-05-06 - Laid on the table subject to call
HB3729 (Same As) 2023-05-06 - Laid on the table subject to call