TX SB422 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the authority of a municipality to impose a fine or fee in certain areas in the municipality's extraterritorial jurisdiction.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the authority of a municipality to impose a fine or fee in certain areas in the municipality's extraterritorial jurisdiction.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-11 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 22 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Vote recorded in Journal (Y: 22 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 22 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 22 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-16HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-05-15HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-05-15HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-05-09HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-05-09HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-05-09HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-05-07HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-05-07HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-05-07HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-07HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-04-29HouseReferred to Land & Resource Management
2019-04-29HouseRead first time
2019-04-12HouseReceived from the Senate
2019-04-11SenateReported engrossed
2019-04-11SenateRecord vote
2019-04-11SenatePassed
2019-04-11SenateRead 3rd time
2019-04-11SenateRecord vote
2019-04-11SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-04-11SenateRecord vote
2019-04-11SenatePassed to engrossment as amended
2019-04-11SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-04-11SenateAmended
2019-04-11SenateAmendment(s) offered FA2 Campbell
2019-04-11SenateRecord vote
2019-04-11SenateAmendment fails of adoption
2019-04-11SenateAmendment(s) offered FA1 Menéndez
2019-04-11SenateRead 2nd time
2019-04-11SenateRecord vote
2019-04-11SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2019-04-11SenateCo-author authorized
2019-04-08SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-04-03SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-04-03SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2019-04-01SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-04-01SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-01SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-02-14SenateReferred to Intergovernmental Relations
2019-02-14SenateRead first time
2019-01-23SenateFiled
2019-01-23SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback