TX SB42 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-27 - House passage as amended reported
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-27 - House passage as amended reported
Summary
Relating to the eligibility of certain employees, postdoctoral fellows, and graduate students to participate in health benefit programs at public institutions of higher education.
Title
Relating to the eligibility of certain employees, postdoctoral fellows, and graduate students to participate in health benefit programs at public institutions of higher education.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-27 | House passage as amended reported | |
2009-05-26 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-26 | Record vote | |
2009-05-26 | Passed | |
2009-05-26 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-24 | Passed to 3rd reading | |
2009-05-24 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-05-22 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | |
2009-05-21 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2009-05-21 | Rules suspended | |
2009-05-20 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2009-05-19 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-19 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-05-19 | Meeting cancelled | |
2009-05-19 | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . | |
2009-05-13 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-05-13 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2009-05-13 | Amendment(s) considered in committee | |
2009-05-13 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-05-13 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2009-05-13 | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . | |
2009-04-29 | Referred to Higher Education | |
2009-04-29 | Read first time | |
2009-04-28 | Received from the Senate | |
2009-04-27 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-04-27 | Record vote | |
2009-04-27 | Passed | |
2009-04-27 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-04-27 | Record vote | |
2009-04-27 | Three day rule suspended | |
2009-04-27 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-04-27 | Passed to engrossment as amended | |
2009-04-27 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-04-27 | Amended | |
2009-04-27 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2009-04-27 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-04-27 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2009-04-21 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2009-04-17 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-17 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | |
2009-04-16 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2009-04-16 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-16 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-02-10 | Referred to State Affairs | |
2009-02-10 | Read first time | |
2008-11-10 | Filed | |
2008-11-10 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB3645 (Same As) 2009-04-28 - Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
HB4505 (Same As) 2009-03-25 - Referred to Higher Education
HB4505 (Same As) 2009-03-25 - Referred to Higher Education
Subjects
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Faculty
EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF TEXAS
GRADUATE STUDENTS
Insurance
Insurance--Life, Health & Accident
TEXAS A&M UNIVERSITY SYSTEM
UNIVERSITY OF TEXAS SYSTEM
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Faculty
EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF TEXAS
GRADUATE STUDENTS
Insurance
Insurance--Life, Health & Accident
TEXAS A&M UNIVERSITY SYSTEM
UNIVERSITY OF TEXAS SYSTEM