TX SB408 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-19 - Co-author authorized
Pending: Senate Intergovernmental Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-19 - Co-author authorized
Pending: Senate Intergovernmental Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to eliminating distinctions in the application of consent annexation requirements.
Title
Relating to eliminating distinctions in the application of consent annexation requirements.
Sponsors
Sen. Brian Birdwell [R] | Sen. Pat Fallon [R] | Sen. Peter Flores [R] | Sen. Bob Hall [R] |
Sen. Bryan Hughes [R] | Sen. Robert Nichols [R] | Sen. Charles Schwertner [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-19 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Filed |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB347 (Same As) 2019-05-24 - Effective immediately
Subjects
City Government
City Government--Annexation
City Government--General
County Government
County Government--General
Military & Veterans
City Government--Annexation
City Government--General
County Government
County Government--General
Military & Veterans
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=SB408 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/SB00408I.htm |