TX SB4 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Passed on June 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-16 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to provisions in agreements between governmental entities and professional sports teams requiring the United States national anthem to be played at team events.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to provisions in agreements between governmental entities and professional sports teams requiring the United States national anthem to be played at team events.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-25 - House - Amendment withdrawn RV#1422 (Y: 110 N: 34 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - House - Amendment fails of adoption RV#1413 (Y: 61 N: 82 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2021-05-24 - House - Amendment fails of adoption RV#1412 (Y: 61 N: 82 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2021-05-24 - House - Amendment fails of adoption RV#1411 (Y: 58 N: 85 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-16 Effective on 9/1/21
2021-06-16 Signed by the Governor
2021-05-27 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-27HouseSigned in the House
2021-05-27SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-05-25SenateReported enrolled
2021-05-25SenateHouse passage reported
2021-05-25HouseReason for vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-25HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-25HouseRecord vote RV#1422
2021-05-25HousePassed
2021-05-25HouseAmendment withdrawn 2-Anchia
2021-05-25HouseAmendment fails of adoption 1-Zwiener
2021-05-25HouseRead 3rd time
2021-05-24HousePassed to 3rd reading
2021-05-24HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-24HouseRecord vote RV#1413
2021-05-24HouseAmendment fails of adoption 3-Dutton
2021-05-24HouseRecord vote RV#1412
2021-05-24HouseAmendment fails of adoption 2-Crockett
2021-05-24HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-24HouseRecord vote RV#1411
2021-05-24HouseAmendment fails of adoption 1-Wu
2021-05-24HouseRead 2nd time
2021-05-24HousePlaced on Major State Calendar
2021-05-20HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-05-20HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-05-20HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-05-20HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-05-18HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-05-18HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-05-18HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-18HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-04-13HouseReferred to State Affairs
2021-04-13HouseRead first time
2021-04-09HouseReceived from the Senate
2021-04-08SenateReported engrossed
2021-04-08SenateRemarks ordered printed
2021-04-08SenateRecord vote
2021-04-08SenatePassed
2021-04-08SenateRead 3rd time
2021-04-08SenateRecord vote
2021-04-08SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-04-08SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-04-08SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2021-04-08SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-04-08SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-04-07SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-04-06SenateNot again placed on intent calendar
2021-03-31SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-03-29SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-03-29SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2021-03-29SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2021-03-26SenateTestimony taken in committee
2021-03-26SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-26SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-18SenateReferred to State Affairs
2021-03-18SenateRead first time
2021-03-12SenateFiled
2021-03-12SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB4
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00004I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00004S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00004E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00004H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00004F.htm
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/SB00004H21.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/SB00004H22.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/SB00004H23.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/SB00004H31.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/SB00004H32.HTM
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00004I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB00004I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00004H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00004F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ04-08-F.PDF#page=6
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB4&RcdVtNo=1411&Ch=H&Dt=05/24/2021
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB4&RcdVtNo=1412&Ch=H&Dt=05/24/2021
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB4&RcdVtNo=1413&Ch=H&Dt=05/24/2021
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB4&RcdVtNo=1422&Ch=H&Dt=05/25/2021

Bill Comments

feedback