TX SB4 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-05-06 - Referred to Natural Resources
Pending: House Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-05-06 - Referred to Natural Resources
Pending: House Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the administration and functions of the Texas Water Development Board; authorizing the issuance of revenue bonds.
Title
Relating to the administration and functions of the Texas Water Development Board; authorizing the issuance of revenue bonds.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-06 | House | Referred to Natural Resources |
2013-05-06 | House | Read first time |
2013-04-30 | House | Received from the Senate |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Passed |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Amended |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Amended |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Amended |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Amended |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Amended |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Amended |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Referred to Natural Resources |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Read first time |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2013-01-23 | Senate | Filed |
2013-01-23 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Governor
LIEUTENANT GOVERNOR
SPEAKER OF THE HOUSE
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Water & Utility
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
WATER
WATER DEVELOPMENT BOARD
Water--Development
Water--General
LIEUTENANT GOVERNOR
SPEAKER OF THE HOUSE
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Water & Utility
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
WATER
WATER DEVELOPMENT BOARD
Water--Development
Water--General