TX SB4 | 2011 | 82nd Legislature 1st Special
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 18 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-18 - Effective on . . . . . . . . . . . . . . .
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 18 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-18 - Effective on . . . . . . . . . . . . . . .
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the composition of the congressional districts for the State of Texas.
Title
Relating to the composition of the congressional districts for the State of Texas.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-18 | Effective on . . . . . . . . . . . . . . . | |
2011-07-18 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-06-24 | Sent to the Governor | |
2011-06-24 | Signed in the House | |
2011-06-22 | Signed in the Senate | |
2011-06-20 | Reported enrolled | |
2011-06-20 | Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported | |
2011-06-20 | Record vote | |
2011-06-20 | Senate concurs in House amendment(s) | |
2011-06-20 | Read | |
2011-06-20 | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate | |
2011-06-16 | House passage as amended reported | |
2011-06-15 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-06-15 | Record vote | |
2011-06-15 | Passed as amended | |
2011-06-15 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-06-15 | Record vote | |
2011-06-15 | Amendment tabled | |
2011-06-15 | Amended | |
2011-06-15 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-06-14 | Record vote | |
2011-06-14 | Passed to 3rd reading as amended | |
2011-06-14 | Amendment as amended withdrawn | |
2011-06-14 | Amendment amended | |
2011-06-14 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2011-06-14 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-06-14 | Record vote | |
2011-06-14 | Amendment tabled | |
2011-06-14 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-06-14 | Record vote | |
2011-06-14 | Amendment tabled | |
2011-06-14 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-06-14 | Record vote | |
2011-06-14 | Amendment tabled | |
2011-06-14 | Amendment adopted as amended | |
2011-06-14 | Amendment amended | |
2011-06-14 | Amendment to amendment withdrawn | |
2011-06-14 | Vote reconsidered | |
2011-06-14 | Vote reconsidered | |
2011-06-14 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-06-14 | Record vote | |
2011-06-14 | Amendment tabled | |
2011-06-14 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-06-14 | Record vote | |
2011-06-14 | Amendment tabled | |
2011-06-14 | Record vote | |
2011-06-14 | Amendment tabled | |
2011-06-14 | Record vote | |
2011-06-14 | Amendment tabled | |
2011-06-14 | Amendment adopted as amended | |
2011-06-14 | Amendment amended | |
2011-06-14 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2011-06-14 | Record vote | |
2011-06-14 | Amendment tabled | |
2011-06-14 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-06-14 | Record vote | |
2011-06-14 | Amendment as amended tabled | |
2011-06-14 | Amendment amended | |
2011-06-14 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2011-06-14 | Amended | |
2011-06-14 | Amendment withdrawn | |
2011-06-14 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-06-14 | Amended | |
2011-06-14 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-06-14 | Record vote | |
2011-06-14 | Amended | |
2011-06-14 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-06-10 | Record vote | |
2011-06-10 | Calendars Committee rule adopted | |
2011-06-14 | Placed on Major State Calendar | |
2011-06-09 | Considered in Calendars | |
2011-06-09 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2011-06-09 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-06-09 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-06-09 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-06-09 | Amendment(s) considered in committee | |
2011-06-09 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2011-06-09 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2011-06-07 | Referred to Redistricting | |
2011-06-07 | Read first time | |
2011-06-07 | Received from the Senate | |
2011-06-06 | Reported engrossed | |
2011-06-06 | Remarks ordered printed | |
2011-06-06 | Record vote | |
2011-06-06 | Passed | |
2011-06-06 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-06-06 | Laid before the Senate | |
2011-06-06 | Remarks ordered printed | |
2011-06-06 | Record vote | |
2011-06-06 | Passed to engrossment as amended | |
2011-06-06 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-06-06 | Amended | |
2011-06-06 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2011-06-06 | Record vote | |
2011-06-06 | Amendment tabled | |
2011-06-06 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2011-06-06 | Record vote | |
2011-06-06 | Amendment tabled | |
2011-06-06 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2011-06-06 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-06-06 | Amended | |
2011-06-06 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2011-06-06 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-06-06 | Laid before the Senate | |
2011-06-06 | Rules suspended | |
2011-06-04 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2011-06-03 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-06-03 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2011-06-03 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-06-03 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-05-31 | Referred to Redistricting, Select | |
2011-05-31 | Read first time | |
2011-05-31 | Filed | |
2011-05-31 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |