TX SB384 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-04-10 - Referred to Public Health
Pending: House Public Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-04-10 - Referred to Public Health
Pending: House Public Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the sale, design, and manufacture of clear aligners.
Title
Relating to the sale, design, and manufacture of clear aligners.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-27 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 23 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-27 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-27 - Senate - Vote recorded in Journal (Y: 23 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-27 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 23 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-27 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-27 - Senate - Vote recorded in Journal (Y: 23 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-27 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 23 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-10 | House | Referred to Public Health |
2023-04-10 | House | Read first time |
2023-03-28 | House | Received from the Senate |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Passed |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Amended |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA1 Kolkhorst |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Vote taken in committee |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Health & Human Services |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-01-12 | Senate | Filed |
2023-01-12 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
DENTISTS & DENTISTRY
Health
Health--General
Health--Other Diseases & Medical Conditions
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Health Occupations
Health
Health--General
Health--Other Diseases & Medical Conditions
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Health Occupations