TX SB371 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 9 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-29 - Placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-29 - Placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the Texas Armed Services Scholarship Program.
Title
Relating to the Texas Armed Services Scholarship Program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-29 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Vote taken in committee |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Vet Affairs |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-01-09 | Senate | Filed |
2023-01-09 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB1192 (Same As) 2023-03-20 - Left pending in committee
HB1192 (Same As) 2023-03-20 - Left pending in committee
HB1192 (Same As) 2023-03-20 - Left pending in committee
Subjects
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Admission & Attendance
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Curriculum
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS
INTERNET
Military & Veterans
PUBLIC NOTICE
SCHOLARSHIPS
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Admission & Attendance
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Curriculum
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS
INTERNET
Military & Veterans
PUBLIC NOTICE
SCHOLARSHIPS