TX SB359 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Vetoed on June 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-01 - Vetoed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on June 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-01 - Vetoed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the authority of a peace officer to apprehend a person for emergency detention and the authority of certain facilities and physicians to temporarily detain a person with mental illness.
Title
Relating to the authority of a peace officer to apprehend a person for emergency detention and the authority of certain facilities and physicians to temporarily detain a person with mental illness.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-13 - House - SB 359Third Reading House (Y: 128 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-01 | Vetoed by the Governor | |
2015-05-20 | Sent to the Governor | |
2015-05-20 | House | Signed in the House |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2015-05-20 | House | Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Senate concurs in House amendment(s) |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Read |
2015-05-19 | Senate | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate |
2015-05-13 | Senate | House passage as amended reported |
2015-05-13 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-13 | House | Record vote |
2015-05-13 | House | Passed |
2015-05-13 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-05-12 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-12 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2015-05-12 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-05-12 | House | Laid out in lieu of companion |
2015-05-05 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2015-05-05 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-05-04 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-04-30 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2015-04-30 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2015-04-30 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2015-04-27 | House | Referred to Public Health |
2015-04-27 | House | Read first time |
2015-04-10 | House | Received from the Senate |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Passed |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Referred to Health & Human Services |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Read first time |
2015-01-27 | Senate | Filed |
2015-01-27 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Health
Health Care Providers
Health--Emergency Services & Personnel
Hospitals
Mental Health & Substance Abuse
PEACE OFFICERS
PHYSICIANS
Health Care Providers
Health--Emergency Services & Personnel
Hospitals
Mental Health & Substance Abuse
PEACE OFFICERS
PHYSICIANS