TX SB357 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-21 - Left pending in committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-21 - Left pending in committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to an exemption from ad valorem taxation of the residence homestead of the surviving spouse of a 100 percent or totally disabled veteran or the principal residence of the surviving minor children of such a disabled veteran.
Title
Relating to an exemption from ad valorem taxation of the residence homestead of the surviving spouse of a 100 percent or totally disabled veteran or the principal residence of the surviving minor children of such a disabled veteran.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-21 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-03-21 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2011-03-21 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-21 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-02-02 | Referred to Finance | |
2011-02-02 | Read first time | |
2011-01-19 | Co-author authorized | |
2011-01-14 | Filed | |
2011-01-14 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
SJR14 (Enabling for) 2011-05-27 - Filed with the Secretary of State
Subjects
Disabilities, Persons with
Military & Veterans
Property Interests
Property Interests--Homestead
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Exemptions
Military & Veterans
Property Interests
Property Interests--Homestead
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Exemptions
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=82R&Bill=SB357 |
Text | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/82R/billtext/html/SB00357I.htm |