TX SB348 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-14 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-14 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to parental access to public school virtual instruction and instructional materials for virtual and remote learning.
Title
Relating to parental access to public school virtual instruction and instructional materials for virtual and remote learning.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-26 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1500 (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - House - Constitutional three day rule suspended RV#1499 (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - House - Constitutional three day rule suspended RV#1499 (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-14 | Effective immediately | |
2021-06-14 | Signed by the Governor | |
2021-06-01 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-05-31 | House | Signed in the House |
2021-05-30 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2021-05-29 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2021-05-28 | Senate | House passage reported |
2021-05-26 | House | Record vote RV#1500 |
2021-05-26 | House | Passed |
2021-05-26 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-05-26 | House | Record vote RV#1499 |
2021-05-26 | House | Constitutional three day rule suspended |
2021-05-26 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2021-05-26 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-05-26 | House | Objections withdrawn |
2021-05-26 | House | Withdrawn from calendar (contested) |
2021-05-26 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2021-05-23 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2021-05-23 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2021-05-22 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-05-21 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-05-20 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-05-20 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2021-05-20 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-05-11 | House | Referred to Public Education |
2021-05-11 | House | Read first time |
2021-05-05 | House | Received from the Senate |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Passed |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2021-04-30 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2021-04-30 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2021-04-30 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Referred to Education |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2021-01-14 | Senate | Filed |
2021-01-14 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
DISTANCE EDUCATION
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Curriculum
Electronic Information Systems
Family
Family--Parent & Child
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Curriculum
Electronic Information Systems
Family
Family--Parent & Child