TX SB345 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the use of land in the William Goodrich Jones State Forest.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the use of land in the William Goodrich Jones State Forest.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-24 - Senate - Senate concurs in House amendment(s) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1645 (Y: 118 N: 26 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-10 Effective on 9/1/19
2019-06-10 Signed by the Governor
2019-05-25 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-25SenateSigned in the Senate
2019-05-25HouseSigned in the House
2019-05-24SenateReported enrolled
2019-05-24HouseSenate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
2019-05-24SenateRecord vote
2019-05-24SenateSenate concurs in House amendment(s)
2019-05-24SenateRead
2019-05-24SenateHouse amendment(s) laid before the Senate
2019-05-22SenateHouse passage as amended reported
2019-05-22HouseRecord vote RV#1645
2019-05-22HousePassed
2019-05-22HouseRead 3rd time
2019-05-21HousePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2019-05-21HouseAmended 1-Toth
2019-05-21HouseRead 2nd time
2019-05-21HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-05-19HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-05-06HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-05-04HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-05-03HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-29HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-04-29HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-01HouseReferred to Agriculture & Livestock
2019-04-01HouseRead first time
2019-03-27HouseReceived from the Senate
2019-03-27SenateReported engrossed
2019-03-27SenateRecord vote
2019-03-27SenatePassed
2019-03-27SenateRead 3rd time
2019-03-27SenateRecord vote
2019-03-27SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-03-27SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-03-27SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2019-03-27SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2019-03-26SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-03-25SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-03-25SenateReported favorably as substituted
2019-03-20SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-03-20SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-20SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-02-07SenateReferred to Higher Education
2019-02-07SenateRead first time
2019-01-11SenateFiled
2019-01-11SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB792 (Same As) 2019-04-23 - Committee report sent to Calendars

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback