TX HB792 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-09 - Reported favorably as substituted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the use of land in the William Goodrich Jones State Forest.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the use of land in the William Goodrich Jones State Forest.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-09HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-04-09HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-04-09HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-03-18HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-03-18HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-03-18HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-03-18HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-18HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-02-21HouseReferred to Agriculture & Livestock
2019-02-21HouseRead first time
2019-01-11HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB345 (Same As) 2019-04-01 - Referred to Agriculture & Livestock

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback