TX SB341 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-18 - Referred to Ways & Means
Pending: House Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-18 - Referred to Ways & Means
Pending: House Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the applicability of the mixed beverage gross receipts tax and the mixed beverage sales tax to items sold by certain nonprofit entity temporary event permittees.
Title
Relating to the applicability of the mixed beverage gross receipts tax and the mixed beverage sales tax to items sold by certain nonprofit entity temporary event permittees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-12 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-12 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-12 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-18 | House | Referred to Ways & Means |
2023-04-18 | House | Read first time |
2023-04-12 | House | Received from the Senate |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Passed |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Vote taken in committee |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Finance |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Read first time |
2022-12-29 | Senate | Filed |
2022-12-29 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |