TX SB340 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 8 2008 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-02-11 - Refer to s/c on Flooding & Evacuations by Pres
Status: Introduced on December 8 2008 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-02-11 - Refer to s/c on Flooding & Evacuations by Pres
Summary
Relating to temporary housing and emergency shelters provided by a political subdivision for disaster victims.
Title
Relating to temporary housing and emergency shelters provided by a political subdivision for disaster victims.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-02-11 | Refer to s/c on Flooding & Evacuations by Pres | |
2009-02-11 | Read first time | |
2008-12-08 | Filed | |
2008-12-08 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB1998 (Same As) 2009-05-27 - Effective on 9/1/09
SB178 (Same As) 2009-03-18 - Reported from s/c favorably w/o amendments
SB178 (Same As) 2009-03-18 - Reported from s/c favorably w/o amendments