TX SB336 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-10 - Effective on 9/1/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-10 - Effective on 9/1/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the qualifications for appointment as a medical examiner.
Title
Relating to the qualifications for appointment as a medical examiner.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-26 - House - SB 336Third Reading House (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-10 | Effective on 9/1/13 | |
2013-05-10 | Signed by the Governor | |
2013-05-01 | Sent to the Governor | |
2013-05-01 | House | Signed in the House |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2013-04-29 | Senate | House passage reported |
2013-04-26 | House | Record vote |
2013-04-26 | House | Passed |
2013-04-26 | House | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-25 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2013-04-25 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-04-25 | House | Laid out in lieu of companion |
2013-04-25 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2013-04-24 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-04-24 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-04-23 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2013-04-23 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-04-18 | House | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence |
2013-04-18 | House | Read first time |
2013-04-16 | House | Received from the Senate |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Passed |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Read first time |
2013-02-01 | Senate | Filed |
2013-02-01 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
County Government
County Government--Employees/Officers
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Health Occupations
County Government--Employees/Officers
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Health Occupations