TX SB325 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-17 - Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to establishing a protective order registry and the duties of court personnel and other persons and entities in regard to the registry.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to establishing a protective order registry and the duties of court personnel and other persons and entities in regard to the registry.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-09 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-17HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-04-17HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-11HouseReferred to Homeland Security & Public Safety
2019-04-11HouseRead first time
2019-04-10HouseReceived from the Senate
2019-04-09SenateReported engrossed
2019-04-09SenateRecord vote
2019-04-09SenatePassed
2019-04-09SenateRead 3rd time
2019-04-09SenateRecord vote
2019-04-09SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-04-09SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-04-09SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2019-04-09SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2019-04-09SenateCo-author authorized
2019-04-08SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-04-04SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-04-04SenateReported favorably as substituted
2019-04-01SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-18SenateLeft pending in committee
2019-03-18SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-04SenateLeft pending in committee
2019-03-04SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-03-04SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-04SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-02-07SenateReferred to State Affairs
2019-02-07SenateRead first time
2019-01-10SenateFiled
2019-01-10SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB629 (Same As) 2019-04-15 - Postponed 4/23/19 10:00 AM

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback