TX SB325 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 10 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-09 - Co-author authorized
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-09 - Co-author authorized
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the automatic enrollment of certain women in the demonstration project for women's health care services.
Title
Relating to the automatic enrollment of certain women in the demonstration project for women's health care services.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-09 | Co-author authorized | |
2011-02-08 | Co-author authorized | |
2011-02-07 | Co-author authorized | |
2011-02-02 | Referred to Health & Human Services | |
2011-02-02 | Read first time | |
2011-01-10 | Filed | |
2011-01-10 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Health
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Health--General
Human Services
Human Services--Medical Assistance
PREGNANCY & CHILDBIRTH
Women
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Health--General
Human Services
Human Services--Medical Assistance
PREGNANCY & CHILDBIRTH
Women
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=82R&Bill=SB325 |
Text | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/82R/billtext/html/SB00325I.htm |