TX SB3 | 2021 | 87th Legislature 1st Special Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on July 16 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-07-16 - Reported engrossed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on July 16 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-07-16 - Reported engrossed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to certain curriculum in public schools, including certain instructional requirements and prohibitions.
Title
Relating to certain curriculum in public schools, including certain instructional requirements and prohibitions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-07-16 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 19 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-07-16 - Senate - Record vote (Y: 18 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-07-16 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 18 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-07-16 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 4 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2021-07-16 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 4 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2021-07-16 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 4 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2021-07-16 - Senate - FA1 Hughes (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-16 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 18 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-07-16 - Senate - Record vote (Y: 18 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-07-16 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 18 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-07-16 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 4 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2021-07-16 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 4 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2021-07-16 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 4 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2021-07-16 - Senate - FA1 Hughes (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-16 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 18 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-16 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2021-07-16 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-07-16 | Senate | Passed |
2021-07-16 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-07-16 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-07-16 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2021-07-16 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-07-16 | Senate | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2021-07-16 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-07-16 | Senate | Amendment fails of adoption |
2021-07-16 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA5 Zaffirini |
2021-07-16 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-07-16 | Senate | Amendment fails of adoption |
2021-07-16 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA4 Zaffirini |
2021-07-16 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-07-16 | Senate | Amendment fails of adoption |
2021-07-16 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA3 Zaffirini |
2021-07-16 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-07-16 | Senate | Amendment fails of adoption |
2021-07-16 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA2 Zaffirini |
2021-07-16 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-07-16 | Senate | Amended |
2021-07-16 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA1 Hughes |
2021-07-16 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2021-07-16 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-07-16 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2021-07-16 | Senate | Ordered not printed |
2021-07-16 | Senate | Printing rule suspended |
2021-07-16 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2021-07-15 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2021-07-15 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-07-15 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2021-07-15 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-07-15 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-07-14 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2021-07-13 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2021-07-09 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2021-07-09 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-07-09 | Senate | Filed |
2021-07-09 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Education
EDUCATION AGENCY, TEXAS
EDUCATION, COMMISSIONER OF
EDUCATION, STATE BOARD OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Charter Schools
Education--Primary & Secondary--Curriculum
Education--School Districts
EDUCATION AGENCY, TEXAS
EDUCATION, COMMISSIONER OF
EDUCATION, STATE BOARD OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Charter Schools
Education--Primary & Secondary--Curriculum
Education--School Districts