TX SB292 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-5)
Status: Passed on June 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-09 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-5)
Status: Passed on June 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-09 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the creation of grant programs to reduce recidivism, arrest, and incarceration of individuals with mental illness.
Title
Relating to the creation of grant programs to reduce recidivism, arrest, and incarceration of individuals with mental illness.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-25 - Senate - Senate concurs in House amendment(s) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - House - Amended RV#1601 (Y: 138 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - House - Amended RV#1601 (Y: 138 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-09 | Effective on 9/1/17 | |
2017-06-09 | Signed by the Governor | |
2017-05-28 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-28 | House | Signed in the House |
2017-05-27 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2017-05-26 | House | Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Senate concurs in House amendment(s) |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Read |
2017-05-25 | Senate | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate |
2017-05-23 | Senate | House passage as amended reported |
2017-05-23 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-23 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-23 | House | Passed as amended |
2017-05-23 | House | Amended |
2017-05-23 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-22 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-22 | House | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2017-05-22 | House | Amended |
2017-05-22 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-22 | House | Placed on Major State Calendar |
2017-05-20 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-05-20 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-05-20 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-05-20 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-05-11 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-05-11 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-05-11 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-05-09 | House | No action taken in committee |
2017-05-09 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-05-06 | House | Posting rule suspended |
2017-05-05 | House | Referred to Public Health |
2017-05-05 | House | Read first time |
2017-04-20 | House | Received from the Senate |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Remarks ordered printed |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Passed |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Amended |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Referred to Health & Human Services |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-01-18 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2016-12-13 | Senate | Filed |
2016-12-13 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
Criminal Procedure--Posttrial Procedure
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Mental Health & Substance Abuse
RECIDIVISM & REPEAT OFFENDERS
Criminal Procedure--General
Criminal Procedure--Posttrial Procedure
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Mental Health & Substance Abuse
RECIDIVISM & REPEAT OFFENDERS