TX SB29 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 17-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-05-25 - Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to requiring public school students to compete in interscholastic athletic competitions based on sex and a study conducted by the University Interscholastic League on the effects of allowing a student to participate in an athletic competition designated for the sex opposite to the student's sex.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to requiring public school students to compete in interscholastic athletic competitions based on sex and a study conducted by the University Interscholastic League on the effects of allowing a student to participate in an athletic competition designated for the sex opposite to the student's sex.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-15 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 18 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 18 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - Senate - Record vote (Y: 18 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 13 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-14 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 13 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-14 - Senate - FA1 Perry (Y: 18 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 18 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-25HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-25HousePostponed 5/25/21 11:30 PM
2021-05-25HouseRead 2nd time
2021-05-25HousePlaced on Major State Calendar
2021-05-23HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-05-20HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-05-19HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-05-19HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-05-07HouseReported favorably as substituted
2021-05-07HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-05-07HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2021-05-04HouseFailed to receive affirmative vote in comm.
2021-05-04HouseAmendment(s) considered in committee
2021-05-04HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-05-04HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-19HouseReferred to Public Education
2021-04-19HouseRead first time
2021-04-15HouseReceived from the Senate
2021-04-15SenateReported engrossed
2021-04-15SenateRecord vote
2021-04-15SenatePassed
2021-04-15SenateRead 3rd time
2021-04-15SenateRecord vote
2021-04-15SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-04-14SenateRecord vote
2021-04-14SenatePassed to engrossment as amended
2021-04-14SenateRecord vote
2021-04-14SenateAmendment fails of adoption
2021-04-14SenateAmendment(s) offered FA4 Menéndez
2021-04-14SenateRecord vote
2021-04-14SenateAmendment fails of adoption
2021-04-14SenateAmendment(s) offered FA3 Menéndez
2021-04-14SenateRecord vote
2021-04-14SenateAmendment fails of adoption
2021-04-14SenateAmendment(s) offered FA2 Eckhardt
2021-04-14SenateRecord vote
2021-04-14SenateAmended
2021-04-14SenateAmendment(s) offered FA1 Perry
2021-04-14SenateRead 2nd time
2021-04-14SenateRecord vote
2021-04-14SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-04-12SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-03-30SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-03-30SenateReported favorably as substituted
2021-03-26SenateTestimony taken in committee
2021-03-26SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-26SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-17SenateReferred to State Affairs
2021-03-17SenateRereferred to committee
2021-03-11SenateReferred to Education
2021-03-11SenateRead first time
2021-03-11SenateFiled
2021-03-11SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB4042 (Same As) 2021-04-20 - Left pending in committee
HB4042 (Same As) 2021-04-20 - Left pending in committee

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB29
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00029I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00029S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00029E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00029H.htm
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/SB00029S2F1.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/SB00029S2F2.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/SB00029S2F3.HTM
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00029I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB00029I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB00029S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00029S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB00029H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00029H.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ04-14-F.PDF#page=27
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ04-14-F.PDF#page=28
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ04-14-F.PDF#page=29
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ04-15-F.PDF#page=3

Bill Comments

feedback