TX HB4042 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 40-0)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-04-20 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Public Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to requiring public school students to participate in interscholastic athletic activities based on biological sex.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to requiring public school students to participate in interscholastic athletic activities based on biological sex.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-20HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-04-20HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-04-20HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-04-20HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-20HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-29HouseReferred to Public Education
2021-03-29HouseRead first time
2021-03-11HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB29 (Same As) 2021-05-25 - Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
SB29 (Same As) 2021-05-25 - Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
SB373 (Similar To) 2021-03-09 - Referred to State Affairs

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback