TX SB288 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to preventing the loss of benefits of and the payment of certain employer contributions for certain retirees of the Teacher Retirement System of Texas who resume service.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to preventing the loss of benefits of and the payment of certain employer contributions for certain retirees of the Teacher Retirement System of Texas who resume service.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-29 - Senate - Senate adopts conference committee report (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-29 - House - House adopts conference committee report RV#1722 (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1371 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-14 Effective on 9/1/21
2021-06-14 Signed by the Governor
2021-06-01 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-31SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-05-31HouseSigned in the House
2021-05-31SenateReported enrolled
2021-05-30HouseSenate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
2021-05-29SenateRecord vote
2021-05-29SenateSenate adopts conference committee report
2021-05-29SenateHouse adopts conf. comm. report-reported
2021-05-29HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-29HouseRecord vote RV#1722
2021-05-29HouseHouse adopts conference committee report
2021-05-28HouseConf. Comm. Report distributed
2021-05-27SenateConference committee report filed
2021-05-27SenateHouse appoints conferees-reported
2021-05-27SenateHouse grants request for conf comm-reported
2021-05-27HouseHouse appoints conferees
2021-05-27HouseHouse grants request for conference committee
2021-05-25HouseSenate appoints conferees-reported
2021-05-25HouseSenate requests conference committee-reported
2021-05-25HouseSenate refuses to concur-reported
2021-05-25SenateSenate appoints conferees
2021-05-25SenateSenate requests conference committee
2021-05-25SenateSenate refuses to concur
2021-05-25SenateRead
2021-05-25SenateHouse amendment(s) laid before the Senate
2021-05-24SenateHouse passage as amended reported
2021-05-24HouseRecord vote RV#1371
2021-05-24HousePassed
2021-05-24HouseRead 3rd time
2021-05-23HousePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2021-05-23HouseAmended 3-Bernal and Wu
2021-05-23HouseAmendment adopted as amended 1-Wu
2021-05-23HouseAmendment amended 2-Wu
2021-05-23HouseAmendment(s) offered 1-Wu
2021-05-23HouseRead 2nd time
2021-05-21HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-05-19HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-05-12HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-05-11HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-05-11HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-04-28HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-04-28HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-21HouseReferred to Pensions, Investments & Financial Services
2021-04-21HouseRead first time
2021-04-20HouseReceived from the Senate
2021-04-19SenateReported engrossed
2021-04-19SenateRecord vote
2021-04-19SenatePassed
2021-04-19SenateRead 3rd time
2021-04-19SenateRecord vote
2021-04-19SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-04-19SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-04-19SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2021-04-19SenateLaid before the Senate
2021-04-19SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2021-04-19SenateCo-author authorized
2021-04-14SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-04-14SenateCo-author authorized
2021-04-13SenateCo-author authorized
2021-04-12SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-04-12SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2021-04-12SenateReported favorably as substituted
2021-04-07SenateTestimony taken in committee
2021-04-07SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-07SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-03SenateReferred to Finance
2021-03-03SenateRead first time
2021-02-23SenateCo-author authorized
2021-01-05SenateFiled
2021-01-05SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB2109 (Same As) 2021-04-21 - Committee report sent to Calendars

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB288
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00288I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00288S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00288E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00288H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00288F.htm
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/SB00288H21.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/SB00288H22.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/SB00288H23.HTM
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00288I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB00288I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB00288S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00288S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB00288E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00288H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB00288F.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00288F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ04-19-F1.PDF#page=3
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB288&RcdVtNo=1371&Ch=H&Dt=05/24/2021
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB288&RcdVtNo=1722&Ch=H&Dt=05/29/2021
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-29-F.PDF#page=100

Bill Comments 750

feedback