NY S06162 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-3)
Status: Engrossed on June 6 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - referred to governmental operations
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 6 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - referred to governmental operations
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Ensures that color vision requirements for appointment of police officers are tailored to only eliminate individuals with extreme color vision deficiencies from eligibility; provides methods under which an individual can meet such requirements after failing to meet an initial color vision standard.
Title
Ensures that color vision requirements for appointment of police officers are tailored to only eliminate individuals with extreme color vision deficiencies from eligibility; provides methods under which an individual can meet such requirements after failing to meet an initial color vision standard.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-01 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-01 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-16 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2024-04-16 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2024-04-16 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2024-03-14 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2024-03-13 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2024-03-12 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.652 |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2023-06-06 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2023-06-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2023-06-06 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2023-05-09 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2023-05-08 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2023-05-03 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.745 |
2023-03-31 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
Same As/Similar To
A06845 (Same As) 2024-01-03 - referred to governmental operations