TX SB28 | 2011 | 82nd Legislature 1st Special
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on June 2 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-22 - Co-author authorized
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 2 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-22 - Co-author authorized
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to reducing state Medicaid and other health care costs by prohibiting smoking in certain public places; providing penalties.
Title
Relating to reducing state Medicaid and other health care costs by prohibiting smoking in certain public places; providing penalties.
Sponsors
Rep. Yvonne Davis [D] | Sen. Rodney Ellis [D] | Sen. Jose Rodriguez [D] | Sen. Carlos Uresti [D] |
Sen. Leticia Van De Putte [D] | Sen. Kirk Watson [D] | Sen. Judith Zaffirini [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-22 | Co-author authorized | |
2011-06-20 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2011-06-20 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | |
2011-06-20 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2011-06-20 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-06-20 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-06-13 | Referred to Health & Human Services | |
2011-06-13 | Read first time | |
2011-06-13 | Co-author authorized | |
2011-06-02 | Filed | |
2011-06-02 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
ALCOHOLIC BEVERAGE COMMISSION, TEXAS
Business & Commerce
Business & Commerce--General
City Government
City Government--General
County Government
County Government--General
Health
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Health--General
MEDICAID
Political Subdivisions
STATE HEALTH SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
Tobacco Products
Business & Commerce
Business & Commerce--General
City Government
City Government--General
County Government
County Government--General
Health
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Health--General
MEDICAID
Political Subdivisions
STATE HEALTH SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
Tobacco Products