TX SB278 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on December 8 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-16 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 8 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-16 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the creation of an offense for failing to secure certain children in a rear-facing child passenger safety seat system.
Title
Relating to the creation of an offense for failing to secure certain children in a rear-facing child passenger safety seat system.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-16 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Referred to Transportation |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Read first time |
2016-12-08 | Senate | Filed |
2016-12-08 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
CHILD SAFETY SEATS
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Child Restraint
Vehicles & Traffic--Rules of Road
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Child Restraint
Vehicles & Traffic--Rules of Road