TX SB277 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-23 - Placed on General State Calendar
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-23 - Placed on General State Calendar
Summary
Relating to the Department of Family and Protective Services, including protective services and investigations of alleged abuse, neglect, or exploitation for certain adults who are elderly or disabled; providing a criminal penalty.
Title
Relating to the Department of Family and Protective Services, including protective services and investigations of alleged abuse, neglect, or exploitation for certain adults who are elderly or disabled; providing a criminal penalty.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-23 | Placed on General State Calendar | |
2009-05-21 | Considered in Calendars | |
2009-05-21 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2009-05-20 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-20 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-05-12 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2009-05-12 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2009-05-07 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-05-07 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-05-07 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-05-07 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-04-06 | Referred to Human Services | |
2009-04-06 | Read first time | |
2009-04-02 | Received from the Senate | |
2009-04-02 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-04-02 | Record vote | |
2009-04-02 | Passed | |
2009-04-02 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-04-02 | Record vote | |
2009-04-02 | Three day rule suspended | |
2009-04-02 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-04-02 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | |
2009-04-02 | Laid before the Senate | |
2009-04-02 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-03-31 | Co-author authorized | |
2009-03-18 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-03-17 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-03-17 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-03-12 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2009-03-12 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-12 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-02-11 | Referred to Health & Human Services | |
2009-02-11 | Read first time | |
2008-11-12 | Filed | |
2008-11-12 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Aging
CHILD ABUSE
CRIMINAL INVESTIGATIONS
CRIMINAL RECORDS
Disabilities, Persons with
ELDER ABUSE
FAMILY & PROTECTIVE SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
Human Services
Human Services--General
CHILD ABUSE
CRIMINAL INVESTIGATIONS
CRIMINAL RECORDS
Disabilities, Persons with
ELDER ABUSE
FAMILY & PROTECTIVE SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
Human Services
Human Services--General