TX SB265 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on December 21 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-03 - Referred to State Affairs
Pending: Senate State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the prohibition of housing discrimination on the basis of a person's source of income and to the enforcement of that prohibition.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the prohibition of housing discrimination on the basis of a person's source of income and to the enforcement of that prohibition.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-03SenateReferred to State Affairs
2021-03-03SenateRead first time
2021-01-26SenateCo-author authorized
2020-12-21SenateFiled
2020-12-21SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB1470 (Same As) 2021-01-29 - Filed

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback