TX SB2587 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 27 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-04-05 - Referred to Local Government
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 27 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-04-05 - Referred to Local Government
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the creation of Fort Bend County Municipal Utility District No. 252; granting a limited power of eminent domain; providing authority to issue bonds; providing authority to impose assessments, fees, and taxes.
Title
Relating to the creation of Fort Bend County Municipal Utility District No. 252; granting a limited power of eminent domain; providing authority to issue bonds; providing authority to impose assessments, fees, and taxes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-05 | Senate | Referred to Local Government |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Recommendations filed with the Senate |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Transmitted to the Governor |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
Subjects
FORT BEND COUNTY MUNICIPAL UTILITY DISTRICT NO. 252
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Municipal Utility Districts
Special Districts & Authorities--Water & Utility
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Municipal Utility Districts
Special Districts & Authorities--Water & Utility
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=88R&Bill=SB2587 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/88R/billtext/html/SB02587I.htm |