TX SB249 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-19 - Left pending in committee
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-19 - Left pending in committee
Summary
Relating to optional fees on the registration of a vehicle imposed by certain counties.
Title
Relating to optional fees on the registration of a vehicle imposed by certain counties.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-19 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-05-19 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-05-18 | Posting rule suspended | |
2009-04-20 | Referred to Transportation | |
2009-04-20 | Read first time | |
2009-04-17 | Received from the Senate | |
2009-04-17 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-04-17 | Record vote | |
2009-04-17 | Passed | |
2009-04-17 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-04-17 | Record vote | |
2009-04-17 | Three day rule suspended | |
2009-04-17 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-04-17 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | |
2009-04-17 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2009-04-16 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2009-04-01 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-01 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-04-01 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-03-30 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-18 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-03-18 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2009-03-18 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-18 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-02-11 | Referred to Transportation & Homeland Sec. | |
2009-02-11 | Read first time | |
2008-11-10 | Filed | |
2008-11-10 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
BORDER
County Government
County Government--Roads
EL PASO COUNTY
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue--Local
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Vehicle Registration
County Government
County Government--Roads
EL PASO COUNTY
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue--Local
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Vehicle Registration